Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/18/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/21/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/21/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/22/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/23/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/17/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/17/2013