Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/20/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/21/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/08/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/09/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/15/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/18/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 04/18/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/23/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/15/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/16/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/12/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/19/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/19/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/19/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/18/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/17/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/07/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/19/2014