There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Electronic Communications Privacy Act Amendments Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Electronic Communications Privacy Act Amendments Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve the provisions relating to the privacy of electronic communications.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/16/2013By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-34. Additional views filed.
04/25/2013Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment. Without written report.
03/19/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
05/16/2013By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-34. Additional views filed.
Action By: Senate
04/25/2013Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 66.
Action By: Senate
04/25/2013Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/25/2013Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/19/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1952-1953)
Action By: Senate
03/19/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1951-1952)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/06/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/11/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/06/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/21/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/29/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/19/2013 Referred to
04/25/2013 Markup by
04/25/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-34

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.607. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (04/25/2013)

Electronic Communications Privacy Act Amendments Act of 2013 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Electronic Communications Privacy Act of 1986 to prohibit a provider of remote computing service or electronic communication service to the public from knowingly divulging to any governmental entity the contents of any communication that is in electronic storage or otherwise maintained by the provider.

(Sec. 3) Revises provisions under which the government may require, pursuant to a warrant, the disclosure by such a provider of the contents of such communications. Eliminates the different requirements applicable under current law depending on whether such communications were stored for fewer than, or more than, 180 days.

Requires a law enforcement agency, within 10 days after receiving the contents of a customer's communication, or a governmental entity, within 3 days, to provide the customer a copy of the warrant and a notice that such information was requested by, and supplied to, the government entity.

Provides that nothing in this Act shall be construed to limit the authority of a governmental entity to use an administrative or civil discovery subpoena to: (1) require an originator or recipient of an electronic communication to disclose the contents of such communication to the governmental entity; or (2) require an entity that provides electronic communication services to employees or agents of the entity to disclose the contents of an electronic communication to or from such employee or agent to a governmental entity if the communication is held, stored, or maintained on an electronic communications system owned or operated by the entity.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes a governmental entity that is: (1) seeking a warrant for the contents of communications to include in the application a request for an order delaying the notification required for up to 180 days, in the case of a law enforcement agency, or up to 90 days, in the case of any other governmental entity; and (2) obtaining the contents of a communication, or information or records, to apply to a court for an order directing a provider of electronic communication service or remote computing service to which a warrant, order, subpoena, or other directive is directed not to notify any other person of the existence of the directive for up to 180 days, in the case of of a law enforcement agency, or up to 90 days, in the case of any other governmental entity. Provides for extensions.

Requires service providers, after such extension, to provide the government three business days' notice of their intent to inform a customer or subscriber that the provider has disclosed the individual's electronic communications information to the government.

(Sec. 5) Directs the Comptroller General to report to Congress by September 30, 2015, regarding the disclosure by electronic communication service providers of customer communications and records, including an analysis and evaluation of such disclosure under provisions: (1) as in effect before the enactment of this Act, and (2) as amended by this Act.

(Sec. 6) Provides that nothing in this Act shall be construed to preclude the acquisition by the U.S. government of the contents of a wire or electronic communication, or of records or other information relating to a subscriber or customer of any electronic communications service or remote computing service, pursuant to the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978, the Wiretap Act, or provisions of other federal law not specifically amended by this Act.