Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/20/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 04/17/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/11/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/13/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 12/10/2014