There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Sandia Pueblo Settlement Technical Amendment Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sandia Pueblo Settlement Technical Amendment Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Sandia Pueblo Settlement Technical Amendment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Sandia Pueblo Settlement Technical Amendment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to make a technical amendment to the T'uf Shur Bien Preservation Trust Area Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/09/2014Became Public Law No: 113-119. (TXT | PDF)
06/09/2014Signed by President.
06/03/2014Presented to President.
05/28/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4860)
03/12/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1595; text as passed Senate: CR S1595)
01/28/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-136.
03/19/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
06/09/2014Became Public Law No: 113-119. (TXT | PDF)
06/09/2014Signed by President.
06/03/2014SenatePresented to President.
05/28/2014-5:39pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4860)
05/28/2014-5:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 611.
05/28/2014-5:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4860-4861)
05/28/2014-5:34pmHouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/13/2014-1:24pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/13/2014-12:33pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/13/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/12/2014SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1595; text as passed Senate: CR S1595)
01/28/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299.
01/28/2014SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-136.
10/30/2013SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/08/2013SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-113.
03/19/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 03/19/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs03/19/2013 Referred to
05/08/2013 Hearings by
10/30/2013 Markup by
01/28/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-136

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-119 (06/09/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on January 28, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Sandia Pueblo Settlement Technical Amendment Act - Amends the T'uf Shur Bien Preservation Trust Area Act to require the Secretary of Agriculture (Secretary), at the request of the Sandia Pueblo of New Mexico and the Secretary of the Interior, to transfer certain National Forest land to the Secretary of the Interior to be held in trust for the Pueblo, if a land exchange with the Pueblo required by that Act is not completed within 30 days of this Act's enactment.

Requires such National Forest land to remain undeveloped in its natural state.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior, with the consent of the Pueblo and after the transfer of the National Forest land is complete, to: (1) transfer to the Secretary the Pueblo's La Luz tract and a conservation easement on its Piedra Lisa tract, and (2) grant to the Secretary a right-of-way for the Piedra Lisa Trail within the Piedra Lisa tract.