Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/19/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/22/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/08/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/15/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/06/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/07/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/13/2013