There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Justice Safety Valve Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to prevent unjust and irrational criminal punishments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/20/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/20/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/22/2013
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/20/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/17/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/10/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/20/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.619. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/20/2013)

Justice Safety Valve Act of 2013 - Amends the federal criminal code to authorize a federal court to impose a sentence below a statutory minimum if necessary to avoid violating federal provisions prescribing factors courts must consider in imposing a sentence. Requires the court to give the parties notice of its intent to impose a lower sentence and to state in writing the factors requiring such a sentence.