Refine your search

16 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
06/13/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-14.
06/13/2013 Signed by President.
06/06/2013 Senate Presented to President.
Action By: Senate
06/03/2013-7:04pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-7:04pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 12 (Roll no. 185). (text: CR H2984-2991)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-6:56pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3001)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-4:54pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-4:35pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 622.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-4:35pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2984-2993)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-4:34pm House Mr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2013-12:59pm House Held at the desk.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
05/09/2013-10:17am House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3275-3282; text as passed Senate: CR S3275-3282)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
03/20/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 31.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
03/20/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Harkin. Without written report.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions