Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/25/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/06/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/08/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/20/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/07/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/18/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/19/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/08/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 08/01/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/10/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/10/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/10/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/28/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/28/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/06/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/06/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/16/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/26/2014