Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/08/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/15/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/16/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/06/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/19/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/27/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/09/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/16/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/23/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/30/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/11/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/16/2014