Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 04/18/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/22/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 06/16/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/07/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/08/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/10/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/14/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/30/2014