Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/23/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/19/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/12/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/17/2014