Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/15/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 04/15/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/15/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/15/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/23/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 04/23/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/25/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/25/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 04/25/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/14/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/14/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/14/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/18/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/18/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/08/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/08/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/17/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/17/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/01/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/10/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/18/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/23/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/23/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/26/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/27/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/11/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/28/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/29/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/29/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/31/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/04/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/19/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/21/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/11/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/12/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/24/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/27/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/27/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/12/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/24/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/25/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/25/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/26/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/26/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/26/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/01/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/03/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 04/03/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/29/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/29/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/29/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/30/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 05/12/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/12/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/05/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 06/05/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/05/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/19/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/31/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/18/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/18/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/18/2014