Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/21/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/11/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/21/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/24/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/26/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/12/2013