Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/22/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/22/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/22/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/06/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/15/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/10/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 08/01/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/06/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/08/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/22/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/26/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/08/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 08/01/2014