Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/08/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/24/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/25/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/27/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/30/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/30/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/11/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/11/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/15/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/15/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/28/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/28/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/28/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/05/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/17/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/18/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 01/06/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 01/16/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/27/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 01/27/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 11/17/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/17/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/20/2014