Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/14/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/14/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/14/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/16/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/16/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/04/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/19/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/08/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/15/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/16/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/10/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 09/17/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/10/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/29/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/19/2013