There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Accountability for Veterans Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require prompt responses from the heads of covered Federal agencies when the Secretary of Veterans Affairs requests information necessary to adjudicate claims for benefits under laws administered by the Secretary, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/09/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/12/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
04/09/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (10)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/22/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/09/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/13/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/14/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/21/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/22/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/23/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/03/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/03/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/20/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/09/2013 Referred to
06/12/2013 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.674.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.674. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/09/2013)

Accountability for Veterans Act of 2013 - Requires that, whenever the head of the Department of Defense (DOD), the Social Security Administration, or the National Archives and Records Administration (agency head) receives a request from the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) for information necessary to adjudicate a veterans' benefit claim, the agency head shall, within 30 days, either: (1) furnish such information; or (2) submit an explanation for not being able to furnish such information, as well as an estimate of when the agency head will be able to furnish such information. Provides for the continuous resubmission of, and required response to, requests not acted upon within the original or estimated period. Requires the Secretary to notify the appropriate claimant of each request made and explanation and estimate received.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) keep records of the information requested and the time it takes to receive responses, and (2) submit semiannually to the congressional veterans committees a summary of such records.