Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/11/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/16/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/16/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 04/16/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/22/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/25/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/13/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 11/13/2014