Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/09/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/11/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/15/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/15/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/16/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/18/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/06/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/06/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/07/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/13/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/20/2013