Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/11/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/11/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/11/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/17/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/23/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/13/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/17/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 08/01/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/07/2013