Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/23/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/04/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/11/2013
Sen. Chiesa, Jeff [R-NJ] 09/18/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/25/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/04/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/11/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/28/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/29/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/30/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/31/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 11/06/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 11/19/2013