Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/10/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/11/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/15/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/15/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/16/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/06/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/06/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/14/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/15/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/23/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/03/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 06/03/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/10/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/24/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/29/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/06/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 11/07/2013