Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/16/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/16/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/17/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/18/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/22/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/22/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/09/2013