Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/11/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/15/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/15/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 04/22/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/22/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/24/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/19/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/21/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/27/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 08/01/2013