Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/12/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/17/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/19/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/27/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/31/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/28/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/07/2013