Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 04/15/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/27/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/27/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/27/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/27/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/27/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/27/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/27/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/27/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/27/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/27/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/30/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/10/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/11/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/19/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/01/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/01/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/06/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/27/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/31/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/02/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/29/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/29/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 08/01/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 11/12/2014