Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/15/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/15/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/23/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/24/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/07/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/04/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/24/2014