Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/18/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/22/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/24/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/19/2013