Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/17/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/18/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/22/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/07/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 05/13/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/15/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/03/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/07/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/11/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/12/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/26/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/08/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/11/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/16/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/17/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/17/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/18/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/18/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/23/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/23/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/24/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/26/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/28/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/05/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/05/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/13/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/27/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/10/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/30/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/30/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 07/31/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/31/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/31/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/08/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/12/2014