Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/17/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/18/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/13/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/25/2014