Limit your search

1-14 of 14
  1. S.Amdt.1657 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  2. S.Amdt.1617 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  3. S.Amdt.1526   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.1484   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.1483   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  6. S.Amdt.1314   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.1297   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  8. S.Amdt.1262   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  9. S.Amdt.1261   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  10. S.Amdt.1251   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Requiring Enforcement, Security and safety while Upgrading Lawful Trade and travel Simultaneously (RESULTS).
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/20/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43. Record Vote Number: 159.
  11. S.Amdt.1222   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To apply the amendments made by the Child Citizenship Act of 2000 retroactively to all individuals adopted by a citizen of the United States in an international adoption and to repeal the pre-adoption parental visitation requirement for automatic citizenship and to amend section 320 of the Immigration and Nationality Act relating to automatic citizenship for children born outside of the United States who have a United States citizen parent.
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1222 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  12. S.Amdt.1208   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require fast-track congressional approval when the Secretary of Homeland Security notifies Congress of the implementation of the border security strategies and certifies that the strategies are substantially operational.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1208, under the order of 6/19/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 39 - 59. Record Vote Number: 156.
  13. S.Amdt.1200   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To provide for enhanced border security, including strong border security metrics and congressional votes on border security and for other purposes.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1200 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 37. Record Vote Number: 154.
  14. S.Amdt.1195   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the granting of registered provisional immigrant status until the Secretary has maintained effective control of the borders for 6 months.
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/13/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1195 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 43. Record Vote Number: 148.