Limit your search

1-19 of 19
  1. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 22
  2. S.Amdt.1713   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  3. S.Amdt.1712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  4. S.Amdt.1635 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.1545   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.1544   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.1543   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.1542   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  9. S.Amdt.1541   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  10. S.Amdt.1540   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  11. S.Amdt.1539   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  12. S.Amdt.1504   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  13. S.Amdt.1415   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  14. S.Amdt.1413   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  15. S.Amdt.1403   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  16. S.Amdt.1337   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  17. S.Amdt.1318   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  18. S.Amdt.1317   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  19. S.Amdt.1182   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3