Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1657 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1617 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1503   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1386   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1250   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1239   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] (Submitted 06/12/2013)