Limit your search

1-10 of 10
  • S.Amdt.1684   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.1683   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.1681   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.1603 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.1390   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.1389   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  • S.Amdt.1368   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.1251   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Requiring Enforcement, Security and safety while Upgrading Lawful Trade and travel Simultaneously (RESULTS).
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/20/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43. Record Vote Number: 159.
  • S.Amdt.1238   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.1198   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To modify the Border Oversight Task Force to include tribal government officials.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1198, under the order of 6/17/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 153.