Limit your search

1-14 of 14
  1. S.Amdt.1735 to S.Amdt.1406   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1733 to S.Amdt.1406   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1713   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1630 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1625 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.1593 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  9. S.Amdt.1415   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  10. S.Amdt.1340   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
  11. S.Amdt.1338   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
  12. S.Amdt.1337   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
  13. S.Amdt.1328   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
  14. S.Amdt.1224   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To clarify the physical present requirements for merit-based immigrant visa applicants.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/27/13 Amendment SA 1224 ruled out of order by the chair.