Limit your search

1-12 of 12
  1. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 22
  2. S.Amdt.1713   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  3. S.Amdt.1712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  4. S.Amdt.1704   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.1559 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.1504   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  7. S.Amdt.1428   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  8. S.Amdt.1403   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  9. S.Amdt.1339   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  10. S.Amdt.1312   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  11. S.Amdt.1242   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  12. S.Amdt.1182   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3