Limit your search

1-4 of 4
  1. S.Amdt.1695   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1311   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1284   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1208   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To require fast-track congressional approval when the Secretary of Homeland Security notifies Congress of the implementation of the border security strategies and certifies that the strategies are substantially operational.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1208, under the order of 6/19/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 39 - 59. Record Vote Number: 156.