Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.1733 to S.Amdt.1406   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.1630 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.1414   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1412   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.1340   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.1337   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  7. S.Amdt.1282   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.1258   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1