Limit your search

1-12 of 12
  1. S.Amdt.1615 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  2. S.Amdt.1527   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.1509   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1363   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.1361   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  6. S.Amdt.1360   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.1359   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.1358   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  9. S.Amdt.1356   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  10. S.Amdt.1351   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  11. S.Amdt.1350   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  12. S.Amdt.1228   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the temporary grant of legal status to, or adjustment to citizenship status of, any individual who is unlawfully present in the United States until the Secretary of Homeland Security certifies that the US-VISIT System (a biometric border check-in and check-out system first required by Congress in 1996) has been fully implemented at every land, sea, and airport of entry and Congress passes a joint resolution, under fast track procedures, stating that such integrated entry and exit data system has been sufficiently implemented.
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1228, under the order of 6/17/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 36 - 58. Record Vote Number: 152.