Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.1729 to S.Amdt.1705   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  2. S.Amdt.1705   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  3. S.Amdt.1557 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.1483   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  5. S.Amdt.1429   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.1392   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.1278   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2