Limit your search

1-13 of 13
  1. S.Amdt.1734 to S.Amdt.1406   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  2. S.Amdt.1657 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  3. S.Amdt.1629 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1617 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  5. S.Amdt.1416   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.1347   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.1299   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.1296   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  9. S.Amdt.1286   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  10. S.Amdt.1251   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Requiring Enforcement, Security and safety while Upgrading Lawful Trade and travel Simultaneously (RESULTS).
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/20/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43. Record Vote Number: 159.
  11. S.Amdt.1250   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  12. S.Amdt.1244   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  13. S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strengthen border security and enforcement.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 06/26/13 Amendment SA 1183 as modified agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 29. Record Vote Number: 163. (consideration: CR S5215)