Limit your search

1-18 of 18
  1. S.Amdt.1720   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 22
  3. S.Amdt.1690   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1668   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  5. S.Amdt.1618 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.1592 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  7. S.Amdt.1558 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  8. S.Amdt.1526   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  9. S.Amdt.1506   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  10. S.Amdt.1504   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  11. S.Amdt.1416   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  12. S.Amdt.1403   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  13. S.Amdt.1297   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  14. S.Amdt.1276   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  15. S.Amdt.1262   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  16. S.Amdt.1261   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  17. S.Amdt.1240   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require training for National Guard and Coast Guard officers and agents in training programs on border protection, immigration law enforcement, and how to address vulnerable populations, such as children and victims of crime.
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/27/13 Amendment SA 1240 ruled out of order by the chair.
  18. S.Amdt.1199   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2