Limit your search

1-11 of 11
  1. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1713   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1668   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1534   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1504   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1403   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.1335   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
  9. S.Amdt.1294   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
  10. S.Amdt.1286   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
  11. S.Amdt.1267   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/13/2013)