Limit your search

1-15 of 15
  1. S.Amdt.1738 to S.Amdt.1406   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 22
  3. S.Amdt.1713   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  4. S.Amdt.1712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  5. S.Amdt.1668   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  6. S.Amdt.1667   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.1636 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  8. S.Amdt.1534   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  9. S.Amdt.1504   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  10. S.Amdt.1428   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  11. S.Amdt.1403   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  12. S.Amdt.1382   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  13. S.Amdt.1327   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  14. S.Amdt.1198   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To modify the Border Oversight Task Force to include tribal government officials.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1198, under the order of 6/17/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 153.
  15. S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strengthen border security and enforcement.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 06/26/13 Amendment SA 1183 as modified agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 29. Record Vote Number: 163. (consideration: CR S5215)