Limit your search

1-16 of 16
  1. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1713   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1592 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1557 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1504   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1429   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.1415   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  9. S.Amdt.1410   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  10. S.Amdt.1403   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  11. S.Amdt.1318   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
  12. S.Amdt.1312   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
  13. S.Amdt.1278   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
  14. S.Amdt.1240   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To require training for National Guard and Coast Guard officers and agents in training programs on border protection, immigration law enforcement, and how to address vulnerable populations, such as children and victims of crime.
    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/27/13 Amendment SA 1240 ruled out of order by the chair.
  15. S.Amdt.1199   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
  16. S.Amdt.1198   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To modify the Border Oversight Task Force to include tribal government officials.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1198, under the order of 6/17/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 153.