Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.1720   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.1506   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.1286   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.1251   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Requiring Enforcement, Security and safety while Upgrading Lawful Trade and travel Simultaneously (RESULTS).
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/20/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43. Record Vote Number: 159.
  5. S.Amdt.1244   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2