Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.1714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 9
  2. S.Amdt.1535   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  3. S.Amdt.1408   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  4. S.Amdt.1311   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  5. S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strengthen border security and enforcement.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 06/26/13 Amendment SA 1183 as modified agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 29. Record Vote Number: 163. (consideration: CR S5215)