Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.1428   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  2. S.Amdt.1327   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  3. S.Amdt.1317   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.1308   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.1268   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To provide for common sense limitations on salaries for contractor executives and employees involved in border security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/13/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1268, under the order of 6/19/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 155.