Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.1735 to S.Amdt.1406   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 22
  3. S.Amdt.1713   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  4. S.Amdt.1712   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 17
  5. S.Amdt.1625 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  6. S.Amdt.1504   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  7. S.Amdt.1403   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  8. S.Amdt.1338   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3